Hayes Lemmerz International Aug 1, 1999 - May 1, 2004
Hs and E Manager
Nebraska Boiler May 2003 - Apr 2004
Safety and Continuous Improvement Manager
Schneider Electric May 2003 - Apr 2004
Safety and Environment Systems and Project Manager
Conagra Foods Oct 1, 1997 - Aug 1, 1999
Safety Leader
Eaton Aug 1, 1989 - Oct 1, 1997
Eh and S
Education:
University of Nebraska at Kearney 1983 - 1988
Bachelors, Bachelor of Science, Physical Science, Education
Skills:
Continuous Improvement Industrial Safety Process Improvement Management Lean Manufacturing Root Cause Analysis Iso 14001 Manufacturing
Interests:
Children
Certifications:
Certified Safety Professional Certified Hazardous Materials Manager Board of Certified Safety Professionals Institute of Hazardous Materials Management